Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Political Party - Retention of Status
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Lierman, and Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering to 10,000 the number of registered voters in the State that must be affiliated with a political party as of December 31 each year in order for the political party to retain its status.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1032 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM