Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Solar Photovoltaic Property - Personal Property Tax Exemption and Local Fee Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the governing body of a county to require, by law, owners and operators of certain solar energy property to pay a certain annual fee to the county; requiring counties to distribute a certain amount of a certain fee to a municipality under certain circumstances; providing for the calculation of the fee; exempting from the personal property tax certain solar energy property; applying the property tax exemption to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0610
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Solar Photovoltaic Property - Personal Property Tax Exemption and Local Fee Requirement
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-301 through 1-311 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM