Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Prosecution for Election Law Violations - Limitation
Sponsored by
Delegate M. Jackson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the period of time after an offense was committed, from 3 to 4 years, during which a prosecution is required to be instituted for certain violations of State election law.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Prosecution for Election Law Violations - Limitation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {325860/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts - Prosecution for Election Law Violations - Limitation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Courts - Prosecution for Election Law Violations - Limitation
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {325860/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Courts - Prosecution for Election Law Violations - Limitation
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Judicial Proceedings 46 Click to view Recorded Media
(   13-604 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:58 PM
Click to return on the top page