Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Maryland Contract Lien Act - Monetary Judgments
Sponsored by
Delegates Norman, Niemann, Healey, Holmes, Jacobs, S. Robinson, and Stein
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that, if the owner of property subject to a lien is personally liable for alleged damages under the Maryland Contract Lien Act, the party entitled to enforce the lien may bring suit, without waiving the lien, for a monetary judgment for the lien amount, plus costs and attorney's fees, without foreclosing on the property, or if the property subject to the lien has been foreclosed, may maintain suit or bring a separate suit for a monetary judgment for any deficiency amount, plus costs and attorney's fees.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {990912/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {990912/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 47
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 46
Senate 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM