Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland College Investment Plan - State Contribution Incentives
Sponsored by
Delegates Queen, Charkoudian, D.M. Davis, Hettleman, Lierman, Lopez, Mosby, Patterson, and Shetty
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Treasurer to make a $100 deposit into an omnibus account for each child born or adopted in the State on or after January 1, 2022; requiring the Maryland 529 Board to administer and manage the omnibus account and to adopt certain procedures to carry out the Act; requiring the State Treasurer, the Maryland Department of Health, the Department of Human Services, and the Board to exchange certain information to carry out the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland College Investment Plan - State Contribution Incentives
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland College Investment Plan - State Contribution Incentives
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   18-19A-01, 18-19A-02, 18-19A-04.2 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:58 PM