Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Reinstatement of Revoked License
Sponsored by
Delegates Vallario, Anderson, Atterbeary, Carter, Conaway, Dumais, Moon, Proctor, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Smith, Sydnor, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the Administration may reinstate the revoked driver's license or privilege to drive of an individual who is involved in two alcohol-related or drug-related driving incidents during a 5-year period only if the Administration conducts a specified investigation and makes a specified determination; providing that the Administration may impose requirements as a condition of reinstatement of the driver's license or privilege to drive, including participation in the Ignition Interlock System Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-503, 2-504, 2-505, 2-506, 3-211 )
(   16-208, 16-404.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM