Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education – School District Energy Use – Policy and Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Solomon
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each school district to adopt or update a school district energy policy beginning July 1, 2022; specifying the contents of a school district energy policy; encouraging school districts to set targets to increase the school district's use of renewable energy and reduce the school district's greenhouse gas emissions; requiring that a school district energy policy be posted on the school district's website and updated every 2 years; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2021
Legislative Date
1/23/2021
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Reassigned to Appropriations
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2021
Legislative Date
2/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education – School District Energy Use – Policy and Study
House 1/23/2021 1/23/2021 Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Reassigned to Appropriations 5 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing canceled
House 2/06/2021 2/06/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
(   5-312.1 )
Last Updated: 2/19/2021 9:15 AM
Click to return on the top page