Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Bromwell, Costa, Cullison, Donoghue, Hubbard, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Proctor, Ready, Reznik, Tarrant, V. Turner, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the information regarding State payments that a specified searchable Web site is required to contain; and requiring the searchable Web site to allow a user to compare data for multiple fiscal years and access specified information regarding specified contracts.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0484
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2014 3/04/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM