Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Use of Funds - Compliance With Watershed Implementation Plans
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing the Cigarette Restitution fund to be used to provide financial assistance to farmers for specified purposes; establishing the Watershed Implementation Plan Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund to provide financial assistance to farmers for implementation of State or local watershed implementation plans associated with the Chesapeake Bay total maximum daily load; requiring the Department of Agriculture to administer the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-808 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM