Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records
Sponsored by
Delegate Healey, Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Secretary of State), and Delegates Anderton, Beidle, Carr, Cassilly, Clark, Flanagan, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gilchrist, Holmes, Jacobs, Jalisi, Knotts, Lafferty, R. Lewis, McCray, McMillan, Otto, Robinson, Stein, and Wivell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Enabling private entities to accept the use of a certain substitute address by a victim of domestic abuse who is a participant in an address confidentiality program; requiring any person to accept a certain address of a participant in an address confidentiality program as the address of the participant; prohibiting a person from knowingly and intentionally seeking and obtaining the actual address or telephone number of a participant in an address confidentiality program; requiring the Secretary of State to adopt regulations; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0578
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {670012/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {113324/2 (Delegate Wilson) Rejected (66-71)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {670012/1 Adopted 40
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Floor Amendment {113324/2 (Delegate Wilson) Rejected (66-71) 40
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 43
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Text - Chapter - Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-519, 4-520, 4-521 through 4-524, 4-525, 4-526, 4-527, 4-528, 4-529, 4-530 )
(   3-101, 3-114 through 3-120 )
(   7-301, 7-302, 7-303 through 7-306, 7-307, 7-308, 7-309, 7-310, 7-311, 7-312 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM