Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Capital Projects - Life-Cycle Cost Analysis
Sponsored by
Delegates Stukes and Boteler
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation to adopt regulations to establish a methodology for applying life-cycle cost analysis to the evaluation of specified pavement projects; requiring that the methodology address specified matters; requiring the Department to utilize the results of the life-cycle cost analysis for specified projects; defining "life-cycle cost analysis"; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0185
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-103.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM