Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Malpractice - Expression of Regret or Apology - Inadmissibility
Sponsored by
Delegates George, Afzali, Arora, Bates, Cluster, Elliott, Fisher, Frank, Glass, Hough, Impallaria, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McDermott, McDonough, W. Miller, Morhaim, Myers, Parrott, Ready, Serafini, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing an exception to the provision of law that an expression of regret or apology made by a health care provider is inadmissible as evidence of an admission of liability or an admission against interest in a malpractice proceeding or civil action against the health care provider; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0279 Session: 2009 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM