Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Recall or Remediation - Documentation of Repairs
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, C. Howard, Jalisi, Luedtke, Morhaim, Patterson, and Turner
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the vehicle emissions inspection program to require that, for a motor vehicle that during an emissions cycle becomes subject to a specified vehicle emissions equipment recall or remediation, the owner of the motor vehicle provide documentation at the time of testing and inspection that the required emissions repairs have been completed; and authorizing the owner of the motor vehicle to provide the repair documentation at the next subsequent scheduled test and inspection under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM