Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
School Buildings - Drinking Water Outlets - Elevated Level of Lead (Safe School Drinking Water Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Solomon
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "elevated level of lead" for purposes of certain provisions of law requiring the periodic testing for the presence of lead in drinking water outlets in occupied public and nonpublic school buildings; and requiring by August 1, 2022, a school to take certain remedial measures on a drinking water outlet tested on or before June 1, 2021, if the test indicated a concentration of lead that was more than 5 parts per billion but less than 20 parts per billion.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0546
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0992 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Text - First - School Buildings - Drinking Water Outlets - Elevated Level of Lead (Safe School Drinking Water Act)
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Last Updated: 2/15/2021 11:40 AM
Click to return on the top page