Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Farmers' Day
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Howard, Aumann, Chang, Fisher, Folden, Hornberger, Jameson, McKay, Morgan, Patterson, Rose, and Sophocleus
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the last day of spring as Farmers' Day; and defining the "last day of spring" as the day before the summer solstice.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-412, 7-412 through 7-416 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM