Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Rental Discount for Baltimore City Police Officers
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Clippinger, Conaway, Glenn, Hayes, R. Lewis, McCray, Mosby, Oaks, and Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, a specified property tax credit against the property tax imposed on specified apartment buildings in Baltimore City; establishing that specified landlords that provide specified rental discounts to specified police officers may be eligible for the tax credit; establishing the amount of the tax credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0526
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Rental Discount for Baltimore City Police Officers
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM