Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones, Gaines, Gibson, Gutierrez, Haynes, Jackson, Korman, Krimm, Reznik, Sophocleus, Valentino-Smith, and P. Young
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the employment categories of certain employees of the State Department of Education; requiring that all positions in the Department be appointed positions in the professional service and skilled service as well as the executive service and management service, subject to a certain exception; repealing the authority for special appointment positions; requiring the Department to determine which employment classifications at the Department would be described as being skilled service or professional service; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0499 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {154565/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-14)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-8)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2018
Legislative Date
5/25/2018
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {154565/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (121-14) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable Adopted 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (37-8) 64
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/25/2018 5/25/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-104, 2-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM