Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on 380 Years of African American History in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates Ivey, Acevero, Bagnall, B. Barnes, Bartlett, Boyce, Cardin, Charles, Fennell, W. Fisher, Jackson, Jalisi, Kelly, Lehman, Lisanti, Patterson, Proctor, and Stewart
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on African American History in Maryland; authorizing the chair of the Commission to employ staff in accordance with an appropriation in the State budget; requiring the Commission to study the history of African Americans in Maryland and produce a written report; requiring the Commission to submit its written report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2022; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commission on 380 Years of African American History in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Commission on 380 Years of African American History in Maryland
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM