Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Change in Administrative Policy Affecting Voting Rights - Notice and Judicial Review
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and Luedtke
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections or a local board of elections that adopts a change in an administrative policy affecting voting rights to provide specified public notice of the change; providing for the form, content, and timing of the public notice; providing that an individual's right to vote may not be denied or abridged because the individual failed to comply with a change in an administrative policy affecting voting rights if the State Board or local board did not provide public notice of the change; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1021
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.
House 3/29/2016 3/30/2016 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 12-301, 12-302, 1-305, 1-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM