Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Anderson, Angel, Arentz, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barve, Beidle, Carozza, Carr, Chang, Clippinger, Cluster, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glass, Glenn, Gutierrez, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Kittleman, Korman, Krebs, Lafferty, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, Malone, McComas, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Parrott, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Rey, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Smith, Stein, Sydnor, Szeliga, Tarlau, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vogt, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, West, B. Wilson, C. Wilson, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a court, under specified circumstances, to terminate the parental rights of an individual convicted of or found to have committed an act of nonconsensual sexual conduct against the other parent that resulted in the conception of a child; prohibiting the court from terminating parental rights under specified circumstances; specifying that a termination of parental rights under the Act terminates completely a parent's right to custody of, guardianship of, and inheritance from, the child; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0593
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {672819/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {368578/1
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {672819/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 51
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 49
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments {368578/1 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1401 through 5-1404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM