Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural Products
Sponsored by
Delegates Reilly, Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Clark, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Krebs, Malone, McComas, McDonough, McKay, Morgan, Otto, Parrott, Rey, Rose, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Shoemaker, Sophocleus, Szeliga, and Wivell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a 5% tolerance from the gross vehicle weight limits for certain vehicles used in certain agricultural activities during harvest time under certain circumstances; and limiting the distance within which a certain vehicle operating under a certain tolerance from a certain gross vehicle weight limit may travel.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1069
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural Products
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural Products
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural Products
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural Products
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural Products
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 46
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed (41-0) 53
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural Products
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM