Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Extensions
Sponsored by
Delegates Waldstreicher, Clippinger, Dumais, Gutierrez, Lee, and A. Miller
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the court, if a motion to extend the term of a final peace order or a final protective order is filed during the term of the order, to hold a hearing within 30 days after the motion is filed; and requiring the court, if the hearing is scheduled after the original expiration date of the order, to extend the order and keep the terms of the order in full force and effect until the hearing.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0434
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 42
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 41
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM