Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Joint Insurance Association - Private Insurers - Notice
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty, M. Washington, Anderson, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, and Lisanti
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring private insurers that deny, cancel, or nonrenew specified coverage for commercial property insurance or homeowner's insurance to provide notice to specified applicants or insureds of the potential availability of insurance coverage through the Joint Insurance Association under a specified provision or another plan; and providing for the application of the Act to all policies and contracts of commercial property insurance and homeowner's insurance issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after October 1, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-117, 25-406, 27-602, 27-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM