Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Class F Vehicles - Modification and Extension
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Patterson, Turner, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making specified modifications to the State income tax credit for the expense of registering specified qualified vehicles in the State; requiring a taxpayer to obtain a tax credit certificate from the Motor Vehicle Administration to receive the credit; limiting to $10,000 the aggregate amount of tax credit certificates the Administration may issue to any one taxpayer and to $500,000 to all taxpayers in a taxable year; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016, but before January 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0057
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Class F Vehicles - Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {205363/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/07 (Delegate Walker) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Class F Vehicles - Modification and Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-4)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Class F Vehicles - Extension
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {205363/1 Adopted 64
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/07 (Delegate Walker) Adopted 64
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Class F Vehicles - Modification and Extension
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-4) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-734.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM