Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Use of Speed Monitoring Systems
Sponsored by
Delegates Impallaria, Aumann, Boteler, Bromwell, Burns, Cardin, Cluster, DeBoy, Frank, Glass, Kach, McComas, McDonough, Minnick, Nathan-Pulliam, Olszewski, Szeliga, and Weir
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that in Baltimore County a violation recorded by a speed monitoring system may be enforced by the issuance of a citation only if the violation occurred during a specified time period and at the time of the violation the sign designating the school zone is equipped and operated in a specified manner; requiring that a speed monitoring system in Baltimore County be placed and adjusted in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-803.1, 21-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM