Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Emergency Management - Governor Declarations
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Military)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to designate a certain emergency area under certain circumstances during a certain state of emergency; prohibiting a state of emergency to continue for longer than 30 days under certain circumstances; requiring certain executive orders or proclamations to include the effective date; establishing that an executive order or proclamation that declares a state of emergency is authority for the activation of State compacts, laws, programs, policies, or regulations that require the declared state of emergency; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Government - Emergency Management - Governor Declarations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Government - Emergency Management - Governor Declarations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-3)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government - Emergency Management - Governor Declarations
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - State Government - Emergency Management - Governor Declarations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (127-3) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/16/2020 6:06 PM