Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Educational Interpreter – Certification Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Qi
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education and the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board to develop certain rules and regulations for the certification of educational interpreters on or before July 1, 2022; providing that certain individuals who are deaf or hard of hearing may not be denied the right to receive certain credentials or a contract for work for which the individual is otherwise qualified because the individual is deaf or hard of hearing; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0464
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education – Educational Interpreter – Certification Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2021
Legislative Date
1/23/2021
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education – Educational Interpreter – Certification Requirements
House 1/23/2021 1/23/2021 Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Last Updated: 3/6/2021 1:27 PM
Click to return on the top page