Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Delegates McCray, Frush, Platt, Tarlau, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to develop, on or before December 1, 2017, goals for percentages of high school graduates for completing specified career and technical education programs and earning specified credentials, and to develop a method to consider a student's attainment of a specified credential or completion of a specified apprenticeship program as equivalent to a specified Advanced Placement examination score for a specified purpose; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0335
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017, July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters
Text - First - Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-204 )
(   11-102, 11-103 )
(   10-741 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM