Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Sponsored by
Delegates West, Angel, Hill, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, and Sample-Hughes
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Dental Examiners to issue a cease and desist order for certain violations; altering certain penalties for certain acts related to the unauthorized practice of dentistry or dental hygiene; altering certain penalties for violating certain provisions of law related to dental laboratory work or advertising a dental appliance; authorizing certain civil fines; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1022 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {166287/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {166287/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
(   4-321, 4-606 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page