Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Licenses Ho. Co. 7-16
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making a Class D (on- and off-sale) beer, wine, and liquor license part of specified groups of alcoholic beverages licenses that the Board of License Commissioners for Howard County may issue to an individual or for the use of a person.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {573992/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments {573992/1 Report Adopted 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Finance 43
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 61A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM