Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Energy Storage - Fuel Cells (Stored Energy and Power (StEP) Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gutierrez, Hixson, Lam, Lierman, McIntosh, Miele, Proctor, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, West, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to establish a pilot program to encourage the use of fuel cells for energy storage in the State; requiring a generator that participates in the pilot program to establish a fuel cell demonstration project; authorizing the Commission to provide incentives for participation in the pilot program; requiring, on or before December 31 of each year, the Commission to report to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on the status of the pilot program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/17/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-211, 7-701, 7-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM