Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Moon, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Fraser-Hidalgo, Kelly, Love, Palakovich Carr, and Stewart
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Substituting the term "cannabis" for the term "marijuana" in certain provisions of law; altering a certain quantity threshold and establishing a certain age limit applicable to a certain civil offense of use or possession of cannabis; establishing a civil offense for use or possession of a certain amount of cannabis for a person of at least a certain age; establishing a Cannabis Regulation Division in the Office of the Comptroller; authorizing the Comptroller to employ certain officers and employees; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0771
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Text - First - Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1201 through 5-1224, 5-601, 5-601.1, 5-620 )
(   12.5-101, 12.5-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM