Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Property Tax Credit - The Bucs Club
Sponsored by
Delegates Shoemaker, Krebs, and Rose
Status
In the House - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Carroll County to grant a property tax credit for specified real property owned by The Bucs Club, Incorporated; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0340
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM