Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transforming Manufacturing in a Digital Economy Workgroup (Making It in Maryland)
Sponsored by
Delegate Qi
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (102-29)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup to Study the Transformation of Manufacturing in Maryland's Emerging Digital Economy; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters relating to the State's current and future workforce and emerging digital economy; requiring the Workgroup to submit an interim and a final report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2021, and December 1, 2022, respectively.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0444
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983395/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-29)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Transforming Manufacturing in a Digital Economy Workgroup (Making It in Maryland)
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {983395/1 Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Transforming Manufacturing in a Digital Economy Workgroup (Making It in Maryland)
House 3/05/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (102-29) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/8/2021 2:16 PM
Click to return on the top page