Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Forests and Parks - Public Recreation on Private and State-Owned Land - Off-Highway Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegates Myers, Afzali, Beitzel, Elliott, Glass, Hogan, Hough, Impallaria, K. Kelly, Krebs, Luedtke, W. Miller, Parrott, Ready, Schulz, Serafini, and Stocksdale
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding a specified liability exemption for a landowner who agrees to the use of a defined part of the landowner's property for cross-country skiing or snowmobiling in Garrett County to apply to the use of an off-highway vehicle in the State.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0533
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2014 2/03/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/03/2014 2/03/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 35
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 36
Senate 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1101, 5-1108, 5-1109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM