Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - State-Provided Health Care Benefits for State Residents (HealthcareMaryland)
Sponsored by
Delegate Reznik
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Office of Health Care Coverage in the Maryland Department of Health to establish and carry out the HealthcareMaryland Program to provide benefits to State residents who do not receive federal benefits through Medicare, TRICARE, plans that are subject to ERISA, or any other federal medical program; requiring the Office to contract with a certain number of managed care organizations; requiring certain employers to pay to the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation a certain annual payroll tax; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018, July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Health - State-Provided Health Care Benefits for State Residents (HealthcareMaryland)
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-901 through 2-906 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM