Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Tick-Borne Disease Interagency Workgroup
Sponsored by
Delegate Adams
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Tick-Borne Disease Interagency Workgroup, the purpose of which is to provide certain expertise and to review activities of federal and State agencies related to tick-borne diseases to ensure coordination, minimize overlap, and examine research priorities; requiring the Workgroup to solicit input from certain stakeholders and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Workgroup to submit a final report to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0557
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Tick-Borne Disease Interagency Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Tick-Borne Disease Interagency Workgroup
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM