Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Speed Monitoring Systems - Local Jurisdictions - Audit and Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegate Braveboy
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a local jurisdiction to report the results of a specified annual calibration check of speed monitoring systems to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31 of each year; authorizing the Governor to require a local jurisdiction to obtain an independent audit of its speed monitoring systems; requiring a local jurisdiction to forward the results of an audit obtained under the Act to the Governor and the General Assembly within 30 days after receipt of the audit; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM