Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Fair Hill
Sponsored by
Cecil County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering a specified allocation of video lottery terminal proceeds dedicated to the Racetrack Facility Renewal Account to include Fair Hill in Cecil County.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Fair Hill
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM