Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit for Business Entities - State of Emergency
Sponsored by
Delegate Chisholm
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County to grant, by law, a tax credit against the county property tax imposed on real property owned or leased by a business entity affected by a state of emergency declared under Title 14 of the Public Safety Article; authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County to provide for the amount and duration of the credit, the eligibility criteria, and the regulations and application process for the credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0261
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2021
Legislative Date
1/28/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit for Business Entities - State of Emergency
House 1/28/2021 1/28/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/11/2021 4:58 PM
Click to return on the top page