Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Nonprofit Youth Development Program - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates D. Barnes, Charles, Conaway, Ebersole, Fennell, W. Fisher, Glenn, Haynes, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Sample-Hughes, Sydnor, Walker, Washington, R. Watson, Wells, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Nonprofit Youth Development Program in the State Department of Education to provide grants to qualifying nonprofit organizations whose mission and programs target at-risk youth using certain strategies; requiring that funds for the Program be provided in the annual State budget; requiring the State Superintendent to review certain applications, award grants meeting certain criteria, and give priority for grants to organizations serving areas with high concentrations of at-risk youth living in poverty; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0682 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {795063/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Department of Education - Nonprofit Youth Development Program - Established
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {795063/1 Adopted 40
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Nonprofit Youth Development Program - Established
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM