Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education Institutions - Sexual Assault, Violence, and Stalking - Prevention and Outreach Policies
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, Barron, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Hixson, Jones, Krimm, Lam, Miele, Platt, Valderrama, C. Wilson, K. Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the governing boards and boards of trustees of each public senior higher education institution and each community college to adopt specified policies, statements, programs, and procedures relating to sexual assault, domestic violence, dating violence, and stalking on or before October 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary and Appropriations
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Reassigned to Judiciary and Appropriations 27
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-601, 11-603, 11-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM