Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Health Enterprise Zones - Modifications
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a specified Health Enterprise Zone employer a credit, in the amount of $10,000, against the State income tax for hiring a qualified position in a Health Enterprise Zone; requiring that the employer create at least one qualified position during a 24-month period; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with the Community Health Resources Commission, to give special consideration to specified applicants when certifying applications for specified tax credits; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {496989/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable with Amendments {496989/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted 45
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 47
Senate 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2014 3/28/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-731 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM