Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Board of Education Districts - Town of Kensington in One District MC 1-13
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the boundaries of specified board of education districts for the Montgomery County Board of Education to place all of the Town of Kensington in one board of education district; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Details
Emergency Bill
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {885969/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments {885969/1 Report Adopted 35
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 35
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-901 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM