Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers
Sponsored by
Delegates Frick, Barkley, Kelly, Lam, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a ticket seller or an operator of a ticket seller's Web site from prohibiting the transfer of a specified ticket, requiring an additional fee for the transfer of a specified ticket, or requiring a purchaser of a ticket to present specified identification or a specified credit card to gain entry to an entertainment event unless a specified notice is provided; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0700
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {793495/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-11)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {793495/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (129-11) 51
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Finance 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-4001, 14-4002.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM