Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County - Practice of Massage - Regulation Ho. Co. 13-16
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Howard County, after consultation with the State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners, to adopt ordinances or regulations relating to verification, inspection, and display of specified licenses issued under specified provisions of law; and requiring the governing body of Howard County to provide that the Howard County Health Officer and the Howard County Police Department have specified authority to carry out specified provisions of ordinances or regulations.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1084 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {256486/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Favorable with Amendments {256486/1 Report Adopted 52
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
House 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 53
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 51
Senate 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 61A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM