Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Harry W. Nice Memorial Potomac River Bridge - Replacement
Sponsored by
Delegates Jameson, Patterson, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State and the Maryland Transportation Authority to finance a replacement bridge for the Harry W. Nice Memorial Potomac River Bridge; specifying requirements for the replacement bridge; stating the intent of the General Assembly; establishing the Harry W. Nice Memorial Potomac River Bridge Replacement Fund and requiring the Authority to make a deposit to the Fund in fiscal years, as specified; requiring the Authority to submit an annual report; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0907
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM