Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB0672


CH0296

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Qualified Residential Treatment Program - Definition
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Services)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 296
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of a "qualified residential treatment program" for purposes of certain provisions of law relating to the placement of children in need of assistance to require that a program, rather than discharge planning, must meet certain license and accreditation requirements.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 296
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Children in Need of Assistance - Qualified Residential Treatment Program - Definition
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Children in Need of Assistance - Qualified Residential Treatment Program - Definition
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Rules 38
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 296
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:15 PM