Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Tuition Waiver for Full-Time Students - Full State Reimbursement
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, B. Barnes, Hettleman, Korman, Sydnor, Turner, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting specified individuals who enroll as full-time certificate or associate's degree students at a community college in the State from payment of tuition under specified circumstances; providing the conditions under which an individual is no longer eligible for a tuition waiver; requiring the State to reimburse community colleges for specified foregone tuition revenue; requiring specified individuals who do not satisfy specified requirements to repay the amount of the tuition waived; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM