Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron and C. Howard
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the amount of wages of a judgment debtor that are exempt from attachment; making a conforming change; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0022
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Judiciary and Economic Matters
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Text - First - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-601.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM